Cross, Karen Michelle (CPSO#: 76318)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Room D4-072
Toronto ON  M5G 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 3868
Fax: (416) 864-5612
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Cross Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Cross ( CPSO# 76318 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Room D4-072
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 15 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN MICHELLE CROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2013