Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Cross, Lisa Adrienne (CPSO#: 58623)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Community Palliative
Medicine Associates
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7A1
Phone: (613) 761-7993
Fax: (613) 724-2149
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lisa Cross Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Cross ( CPSO# 58623 )

Business Address:
Community Palliative Medicine Associates
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7A1
Phone Number: (613) 761-7993

Medical Records Location

Address: Accuro Unit 312 700 Industrial Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K1G 0Y9 Tel: (613) 738-1242 Fax: (613) 738-0562 Website: http://www.accuro.ca
Date Received: 05 Nov 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA ADRIENNE CROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROSS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1989