Cross, William Grant (CPSO#: 53760)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William Cross Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Cobourg Medical Centre Unit 5 1060 Burnham Street Cobourg, ON K9A 5V9
Date Received: 27 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016