Crossley, John George (CPSO#: 69902)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site
237 Barton Street
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46368
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN GEORGE CROSSLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROSSLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999