Crouse, Wanda Jean (CPSO#: 50306)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 1999