Crouzat, Frederic Bernard (CPSO#: 72482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
14 College Street
Suite 601
Toronto ON  M5G 1K2
Phone: (416) 960-0145
Fax: (416) 960-0489
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Newmarket Clinic
Unit 8
17310 Yonge Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 7R8
Canada
Phone: (905) 868-9966
Fax: (905) 868-9495
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Queen Street Treatment Clinic
1194 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1J6
Canada
Phone: (416) 538-3839
Fax: (416) 538-8738
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FREDERIC BERNARD CROUZAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROUZAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2000