Crouzat, Michael Georges (CPSO#: 71214)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
BMC CFB - Petawawa
Petawawa ON  K8H 2X3
Phone: (613) 687-5511 Ext. 3746
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Crouzat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Crouzat ( CPSO# 71214 )

Business Address:
Chalk River Laboratories
Chalk River ON  K0J 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 584-8811

Business Address:
BMC CFB Petawawa
Petawawa ON  K8H 2X3
Phone Number: (613) 687-5511

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL GEORGES CROUZAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROUZAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999