Crowe, Philip John (CPSO#: 55036)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Sep 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Sep 1991