Crowley, James Declan (CPSO#: 41926)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 25 Mar 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1973
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 30 Sep 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jun 2003