Crowson, Arthur Neil (CPSO#: 33098)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4142 S Mingo Road
Tulsa OK  74142
United States
Phone: (918) 744-2553
Fax: (918) 744-3327

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona
USA - Hawaii
USA - Kansas
USA - New York
USA - Oklahoma
USA - Texas
USA - Wisconsin

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 12 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARTHUR NEIL CROWSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROWSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1984