Crowther, Mark Andrew (CPSO#: 62142)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Hospital
Room L-208
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6024
Fax: (905) 540-6568
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Crowther Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Crowther ( CPSO# 62142 )

Business Address:
L208- 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6024

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK ANDREW CROWTHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROWTHER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1991