Crozier, Melanie Andrea (CPSO#: 81006)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 406
265 Front Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 7X1
Phone: (519) 337-5600
Fax: (519) 337-0439
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melanie Crozier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Crozier ( CPSO# 81006 )

Business Address:
Suite 406
265 Front Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 7X1
Phone Number: (519) 337-5600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE ANDREA CROZIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROZIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006