Crozier, Robert Samuel (CPSO#: 54652)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 17 Oct 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Oct 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2002
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2014
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 13 Jan 2016
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 17 Oct 2016

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Oct 2016
Summary:

On October 17, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario found that Dr. Robert Samuel Crozier committed an act of professional misconduct in 
that he: engaged in sexual abuse of patients, engaged in an act or omission relevant to the 
practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded 
by members as disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional; and has been found guilty of an 
offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise. 

Dr. Robert Crozier, a physician with a specialty in psychiatry, practised in London, Ontario. 

PATIENT A 

Patient A began seeing Dr. Crozier for psychiatric care in 2007 and attended appointments with 
him regularly until 2013. Dr. Crozier diagnosed Patient A with depression. 

At the end of an appointment in December 2013, Dr. Crozier and Patient A hugged while sitting 
on the couch within the office. Dr. Crozier then fondled Patient A’s breast. Dr. Crozier stopped 
for a short time. He then moved his hands up inside of Patient A’s shirt and began fondling her 
breasts and nipple. He asked her if she liked this, to which she stated “No.” Dr. Crozier then 
asked if she had experienced an orgasm before, advising that it relieved stress. 

Patient A then left the couch, stood up, and put her coat on. As Patient A was leaving the office, 
she told Dr. Crozier she was uncomfortable about what had occurred, at which time he 
apologized and stated that he had made a huge mistake. Patient A then left the office, returned 
home, and subsequently reported the incident to the police, who investigated the matter.  

The police interviewed Dr. Crozier later on in December 2013, wherein he admitted to several 
aspects of this incident. Dr. Crozier was accordingly arrested for sexual assault. Dr. Crozier was 
released with conditions including that he not contact Patient A. 

Later that day, when Patient A was at home, she received a phone call from a number that Patient 
A recognized as being the number of the Dr. Crozier’s workplace at about 6:46 p.m. Patient A 
did not answer this call and Dr. Crozier’s voice was subsequently heard to be leaving a message 
for her. Over the next two hours, Dr. Crozier proceeded to contact Patient A ten more times, 
leaving five more voice messages for her begging for forgiveness. This was in violation of his 
release conditions.  

On October 9, 2014, Dr. Crozier pled guilty to the sexual assault of Patient A. He was sentenced 
to four months in custody and probation for two years. Dr. Crozier was further required to 
comply with the Sexual Offender Registry for a period of ten years.  

PATIENT B 

Patient B regularly saw Dr. Crozier for psychiatric care between 2005 and 2013. In September 
2013, Dr. Crozier provided Patient B with diagnoses including anxiety and depression. 

In 2013, Patient B attended Dr. Crozier’s office for a scheduled appointment. During the 
appointment Dr. Crozier asked Patient B if she wanted a hug. Dr. Crozier came over to Patient B 
and sat down on the couch next to her. Dr. Crozier hugged Patient B and touched her breast with 
                                      2 
 
his hand. Dr. Crozier then hugged Patient B again and touched her breast with his hand again. 
Patient B attempted to brush away Dr. Crozier’s hand.  

Dr. Crozier told Patient B that she had been through so much and that he wanted to give her 
another hug. Dr. Crozier indicated that he was thinking that Patient B could take off her top. 
Patient B replied that she felt this was highly inappropriate.  

Patient B told Dr. Crozier that she needed to get going as she had a pot roast on for dinner, but 
that she needed a new prescription. Dr. Crozier told Patient B that he hoped she could forgive 
him if he had been inappropriate.  

Patient B returned home and told her husband what had transpired. Her husband called Dr. 
Crozier’s office asking for a call back. Dr. Crozier returned her husband’s call and admitted to 
“crossing the line” with Patient B. Dr. Crozier called back shortly thereafter on two occasions, 
apologizing and inquiring if Patient B would return to see him. Dr. Crozier subsequently left two 
voice messages at Patient B’s home, apologizing and attempting to explain his behaviour. 

PATIENT C 

Patient C first met Dr. Crozier on a date in 1993 further to a referral from her family physician. 
Dr. Crozier saw Patient C for regular appointments until 2000 and prescribed medications to 
Patient C to address her anxiety. 

In 1997, Dr. Crozier’s child was born with serious health problems. Around this time, Patient C 
offered comfort to Dr. Crozier. He accepted, holding her hand and sitting beside her on the couch 
during her sessions. Dr. Crozier also accepted comforting touches on the shoulder from Patient C 
on at least one occasion. 

Dr. Crozier accepted Patient C’s offer to speak about his stress and he did so, discussing his 
child’s health, the impact upon him (including his use of alcohol) and other aspects of his 
personal life, including his marital difficulties. During these discussions, Dr. Crozier sat beside 
Patient C and held her hand while they talked. This occurred at several appointments in 1997.  

Over the course of the next two years, Patient C advised Dr. Crozier that she had developed 
feelings for him. Patient C attended unannounced at Dr. Crozier’s home on two occasions. Dr. 
Crozier did not take steps to discharge Patient C from his practice until 2006. 

Dr. Crozier ceased practising in 2000 for about two years due to alcohol abuse. Prior to the 
completion of treatment for his substance abuse disorder, Patient C asked Dr. Crozier for money. 
Patient C told Dr. Crozier that she needed money because her family was not doing well 
financially. She threatened to report Dr. Crozier to the College for his boundary crossings with 
her in 1997 and for his alcohol use if Dr. Crozier did not provide her with money.  

Dr. Crozier provided Patient C with several thousand dollars in 1997. Thereafter Patient C 
continued to threaten Dr. Crozier and ask him for money. He continued to pay her with the 
exception of two years until the fall of 2013. Dr. Crozier estimates having paid Patient C a total 
of approximately $150,000.00. 
                                      3 
 
Dr. Crozier received residential treatment for alcohol abuse (substance abuse disorder) in 2000 
and 2001. He returned to the practice of medicine in the middle of 2002. Upon his return to 
practice, Dr. Crozier saw Patient C for appointments from July 2002 to September 2006.  

The allegations with respect to Patient C came to the College’s attention in July of 2014 through 
a third party. 

 

PENALTY 

On October 17, 2016, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
   -  the Registrar revoke Dr. Crozier’s certificate of registration, effective immediately. 
   -  Dr. Crozier appear before the panel to be reprimanded.  
   -  Dr. Crozier reimburse the College for funding  provided to  Patient  A and B under the 
      program  required  under  section  85.7  of  the  Code,  by  posting  an  irrevocable  letter  of 
      credit or other security acceptable to the College, by November 17, 2016, in the amount 
      of $32,120.00. 
   -  Dr. Crozier pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,000.00 by November 17, 2016.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Oct 17, 2016