Cruchley, Patricia Margaret (CPSO#: 32500)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Mary's General Hospital
Dept of Anaesthesiology
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N1B 3M2
Phone: (519) 749-6690
Fax: (519) 749-6691
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 10 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA MARGARET CRUCHLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRUCHLEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1981
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2004