Cruess, Alan Foster (CPSO#: 31379)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Mar 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Mar 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Eye Care Centre
Room 2035-2 West Victoria
1276 South Park St.
Halifax NS  B3H 2Y9
Phone: (902) 473-7215
Fax: (902) 473-2839

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 18 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN FOSTER CRUESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRUESS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1980