Cruickshank, Matthew Jon (CPSO#: 95320)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
625 Queen Street East, Suite 108
Toronto ON  M4M 1G7
Phone: 647-479-8410
Fax: 647-689-3079
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew Cruickshank Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cruickshank ( CPSO# 95320 )

Business Address:
Suite 108
625 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 1G7
Phone Number: (647) 479-8410

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW JON CRUICKSHANK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRUICKSHANK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2013