Cruickshanks, Giles Fraser (CPSO#: 69116)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Sep 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Giles Cruickshanks Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Cruickshanks ( CPSO# 69116 )

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  July 4, 2016
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On July 15, 2016, Southlake Regional Health Centre notified the College that Dr. Giles Cruickshanks' privileges were suspended on an interim basis effective July 4, 2016.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 25 Sep 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 25 Sep 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from September 25, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Giles Fraser
            Cruickshanks, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Cruickshanks to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Cruickshanks has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all
                  jurisdictions
                  at this time.