Cruickshanks, Sonia Maria (CPSO#: 69223)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Dec 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2000

Summary

Former Names: Lacika-Cruickshanks, Sonia Maria (used until: 20 Sep 2001 )     Lacika, Sonia Maria (used until: 12 Jun 2000 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Slovak

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
679 Davis Drive
Suite 308
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone: (905) 836-1600
Fax: (905) 836-5712
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SONIA MARIA CRUICKSHANKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRUICKSHANKS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2000