Crummey, Stephen Arthur (CPSO#: 71281)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 2011