Crump, Richard Michael (CPSO#: 53924)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
OPG 6-426
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4567
Fax: (416) 946-4520
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 22 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD MICHAEL CRUMP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRUMP is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 01 Mar 1992
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1987