Crysdale, William Seymour (CPSO#: 22000)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: ENT Associates 125 Bell Farm Road Barrie, ON L4M 6L2 The Hospital for Sick Children 555 University Avenue Toronto, ON M5G 1X8
Instructions: Patient medical records are located at ENT Associates (Barrie) and The Hospital for Sick Children (Toronto).
Date Received: 22 Apr 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014