Crysler, John Gregory (CPSO#: 65382)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9 Court Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 4R3
Phone: (905) 682-5411
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN GREGORY CRYSLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRYSLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2001