Crystal, Eugene (CPSO#: 75607)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Sep 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Sep 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:Vitebsk State Medical Institute, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Cardiology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 7370
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Womens College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 4076
3080 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Canada
Phone: (647) 347-6644
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eugene Crystal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Crystal ( CPSO# 75607 )

Business Address:
4076 - 3080 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Phone Number: (647) 347-4466

Business Address:
236 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 1E2
Phone Number: (905) 885-1860

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Cardiology Department
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite A222
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 23 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 21 Aug 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Aug 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 16 Sep 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 16 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 16 Sep 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Nov 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Nov 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Eugene Crystal may practise medicine independently in cardiology, only.