Cserti-Gazdewich, Christine Margaret (CPSO#: 74716)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: Cserti, Christine Margaret (used until: 18 Mar 2008 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN The Toronto General Hospital
Blood Transfusion Medicine
3 E C - 306
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 5390
Fax: (416) 340-5410
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 21 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MARGARET CSERTI-GAZDEWICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CSERTI-GAZDEWICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2006