Cuartero Sala, Mireia (CPSO#: 99636)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Nov 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Barcelona, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 21 Nov 2012 to 07 Feb 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Nov 2013
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2013