Cuberovic, Nick Bogosav (CPSO#: 58321)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1988

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English, French, Serbian

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Health Care Services
Milton Site
7030 Derry Road East
Milton ON  L9T 2X5
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cuberovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Cuberovic ( CPSO# 58321 )

Business Address:
Halton Health Care Services
Milton Site
7030 Derry Road East
Milton ON  L9T 2X5
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICK BOGOSAV CUBEROVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUBEROVIC is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1988

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 18, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)