Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Cuddihy, Pamela Margaret (CPSO#: 62925)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Sep 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Names: Saccomanno, Pamela Margaret (used until: 22 Jan 2013 )     Cuddihy, Pamela Margaret (used until: 22 Aug 1994 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Goodfellow Building
Suite 205
170 McEwan Drive East
Bolton ON  L7E 4C8
Phone: (905) 857-3223
Fax: (905) 857-1553
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cuddihy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 22 2016


Corporation Name: Cuddihy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Cuddihy ( CPSO# 62925 )

Business Address:
The Fibro Pain Clinic
43 Queen Street South
Bolton ON  L7E 1C4
Phone Number: (905) 857-3223

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 09 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1994
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 25 Sep 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 25 Sep 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from September 25, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Pamela Margaret
            Cuddihy, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Cuddihy to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking") 
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. PAMELA MARGARET CUDDIHY
                                          ("Dr. Cuddihy") 
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the
                  Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
                  "Narcotic Drugs" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                  the
                  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended.
                  
                  "Narcotic Preparations" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                  under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as
                  amended.
                  
                  "Controlled Drugs" means from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
                  under the
                  Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27, as amended.
                  
                  "Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances" means from the
                  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the
                  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended
                  
                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
                        as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
                        hereto as Schedule "B")
                  
                  "All other Monitored Drugs" means as defined under the Narcotics Safety
                  and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended, as noted in
                  Schedule "C".
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, certificate of registration number 62925, am a member of
                  the College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, acknowledge that the College received information from
                  the NMS and initiated an investigation bearing File Number 7215565 (the
                  "Investigation") into whether I failed to maintain the standard of
                  practice of the profession and/or am incompetent in my prescribing of
                  controlled substances, including narcotics.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking
                  effective upon the date I sign it (the "Effective Date").

            (5)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, shall keep a Log of all prescriptions for Narcotic Drugs,
                  Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                  Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the form attached
                  as set out in Schedule "D", which will include at least the following
                  information (the "Prescribing Log"):

                  (i)   the date of the appointment;
                  (ii)  the name of the patient and chart/file number;
                  (iii) the name of the medication prescribed, dose, direction, number of
                        tablets to be dispensed and frequency;
                  (iv)  the clinical indication;
                  (v)   whether the prescription is for a new medication and/or different
                        dose or frequency than currently prescribed to the patient (Y/N);
                  (vi)  Dr. Cuddihy's signature;
                  (vii) the date of the Clinical Supervisor's review (if applicable, as set
                        out below); and
                  (viii)the Clinical Supervisor's signature (if applicable, as set out
                        below).
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, undertake to keep a copy of all prescriptions I write for
                  Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                  and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the
                  corresponding patient chart.

            (7)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for a minimum of six (6) months on the terms set
                        out below (the "Clinical Supervision").

                  (b)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, acknowledge and undertake that the Clinical
                        Supervision set out below will only cease upon recommendation of
                        the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval by the College.
                  
                  Clinical Supervision
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, undertake to meet with my Clinical Supervisor(s) at
                        least once every month to discuss the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s
                        review of:
                        i.    15 charts for patients to whom I have prescribed Narcotic
                              Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                              Monitored Drugs since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                              review, or if since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review
                              there are not 15 patients listed in the Prescribing Log to
                              whom I have prescribed Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations,
                              Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                              Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, then the charts of
                              all patients listed in the Prescribing Log since the Clinical
                              Supervisor's prior review; and
                        ii.   At least 10 charts of patients to whom I have initiated a new
                              prescription for:
                              1.    Narcotic Drugs, or
                              2.    Narcotic Preparations; or
                              3.    Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                                    Substances and All other Monitored Drugs where the
                                    patient is also prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or
                                    Narcotic Preparation,
                              or if since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review there
                              are not 10 patients listed in the Prescribing Log to whom I
                              have initiated a new prescription for Narcotic Drugs,
                              Narcotic Preparations or Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                              and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs
                              where the patient is also prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or
                              Narcotic Preparation, then the charts of all patients listed
                              in the Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor's prior
                              review.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, acknowledge that the Clinical Supervisor(s) must
                        sign and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the charts that the
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) has reviewed and discussed with me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, acknowledge that the Clinical Supervisor(s) will
                        provide a report to the College at least once every month.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, acknowledge that after a minimum of six (6) months
                        of Clinical Supervision, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied
                        that I have the necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to
                        practice without  supervision, the Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        recommend to the College that the Clinical Supervision cease.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, acknowledge and undertake that the Clinical
                        Supervision will only cease upon recommendation of the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) and approval by the College.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Schedule "E", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). In
                        addition to what is set out above, the Clinical Supervisor(s) will,
                        at a minimum:
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Schedule
                              "F";
                  
                        (ii)  Discuss any concerns with me arising from chart reviews and
                              observations;
                  
                        (iii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; and
                  
                        (iv)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision.
                  
                  (i)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, undertake that all meetings with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will take place at my Practice Location, or another
                        Location approved by the College;
                  
                  (j)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, acknowledge that all charts reviewed shall be
                        independently selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the
                        educational needs identified in the IEP set out at Schedule "F" to
                        my Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                        report of the medical inspector dated May 14, 2017, and concerns
                        that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (k)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the terms of this
                        Undertaking and Schedule "E" attached, and to abide by the
                        reasonable recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including
                        but not limited to, any reasonable recommended practice
                        improvements and ongoing professional development.
                  
                  (l)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, undertake to ensure that Schedule "E" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within fourteen
                        (14) days of the Effective Date.

                  (m)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Schedule "E" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        fourteen (14) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (n)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the terms set out in sections (7)(l) and/or (m)
                        above, I will cease prescribing Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                        Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                        Substances and All other Monitored Drugs until such time as I have
                        obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.
                  
                  (o)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, agree that if I am required to cease prescribing
                        Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                        Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                        Monitored Drugs as a result of section (7)(n) above this will
                        constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of
                        registration and that term, condition or limitation will be
                        included on the Public Register.
                  
            (8)   Professional Education

                  (a)   In the course of this investigation, I, Dr. Cuddihy, voluntarily
                        enrolled in the University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program
                        in Safe Opioid Prescribing (all three workshops):
                        www.cepd.utoronto.ca/opioidprescribing.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all elements of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Schedule "F", including but not limited to, the following elements
                        of professional education (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program in Safe
                              Opioid Prescribing (all three webinars and in-person
                              workshop): www.cepd.utoronto.ca/opioidprescribing;
                  
                        (ii)  Review and discuss with my Clinical Supervisor(s) the
                              following resources:
                  
                              1.    CPSO Policy "Prescribing Drugs":
                                    http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-
                                    Publications/Policy/Prescribing-Drugs;
                  
                              2.    2017 Canadian Guideline for Opioids for Chronic
                                    Non-Cancer Pain:
                                    http://nationalpaincentre.mcmaster.ca/guidelines.html;
                  
                              3.    CMPA advice regarding preventing the misuse of opioids
                                    https://www.cmpa-acpm.ca/en/advice-publications/browse-
                                    articles/2015/preventing-the-misuse-of-opioids;
                  
                              4.    the Centre for Effective Practice Management of Chronic
                                    Non- Cancer Pain Tool https://thewellhealth.ca/cncp

                        (iii) Review and discuss with my Clinical Supervisor(s) the CPSO
                              Policy "Medical Records":  http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-
                              Publications/Policy/Medical-Records;
                  
                        (iv)  Review and discuss with my Clinical Supervisor(s) the CPSO
                              Policy "ConsenttoTreatment":
                              http://www.cpso.on.ca/CPSO/media/documents/Policies/Policy-
                              Items/Consent-To-Treatment.pdf?ext=.pdf; and
                  
                        (v)   any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of each element of the Professional Education
                        specified above, including proof of registration, attendance and
                        participant assessment reports where available, within one (1)
                        month of completion of each element. I acknowledge that the College
                        will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully
                        completed each element of the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
            (9)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the Clinical Supervision set out under section 7 of the Undertaking
                        has ceased, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice by an
                        assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Reassessment").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may
                        include a chart review, direct observation of my care, an interview
                        of me, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment
                        conducted under the terms of this Undertaking
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) may receive and review the findings of the
                        Assessor(s), and may discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or
                        concerns arising from the Reassessment.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and that the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.

            (10)  Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        Location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within ten
                        (10) business days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within ten (10) business days of commencing practice at
                        that Location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics
                        Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010 and/or any person or institution who may
                        have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Schedule "G" and Schedule "H",
                        respectively.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Cuddihy, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Cuddihy, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Cuddihy, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Cuddihy, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (15)  I, Dr. Cuddihy, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (16)  I, Dr. Cuddihy, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code.



            (17)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cuddihy, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with the section above, the following
                        summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
                        period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        The College received information from the Narcotics Monitoring
                        System about Dr. Cuddihy's prescribing of controlled substances,
                        including narcotics.
                  
                        Based on the information received, the College conducted an
                        investigation into whether Dr. Cuddihy failed to maintain the
                        standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in
                        his prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.  As
                        a result of the investigation:
                  
                  
                        *     Dr. Cuddihy's prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic
                              preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other
                              targeted substances, and other monitored drugs will be
                              supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College
                              for minimum of six (6) months.
                  
                        *     Dr. Cuddihy will engage in professional education in the
                              prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.
                  
                        *     Following the professional education and period of
                              supervision, Dr. Cuddihy's prescribing of controlled
                              substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by an
                              assessor selected by the College.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (18)  I, Dr. Cuddihy, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information  to  any  person  who  requires  this  information
                  for  the  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional
                  Education and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (19)  I, Dr. Cuddihy, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (20)  I, Dr. Cuddihy, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Schedule "E";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which he or she reasonably believes
                        indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 25, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
The College received information from the Narcotics Monitoring System about Dr. Cuddihy's prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Based on the information received, the College conducted an investigation into whether Dr. Cuddihy failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics. As a result of the investigation:

- Dr. Cuddihy's prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, and other monitored drugs will be supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for minimum of six (6) months.

- Dr. Cuddihy will engage in professional education in the prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

- Following the professional education and period of supervision, Dr. Cuddihy's prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by an assessor selected by the College.