Cuffari, Carmelo (CPSO#: 60756)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Dec 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CMSC 2-125
600 North Wolfe Street
Baltimore MD  21287
United States
Phone: (410) 955-8769
Fax: (410) 955-1464

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Maryland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 23 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARMELO CUFFARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUFFARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1990