Cujec, Bibiana (CPSO#: 52867)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Laval University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 01 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988