Culbert, Erin Lia (CPSO#: 77509)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: 905-813-1100
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Erin Culbert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Culbert ( CPSO# 77509 )

Business Address:
301 - 2227 South Millway
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Phone Number: (905) 569-9798

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-4941

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN LIA CULBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CULBERT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006