Culic, Cherie Ann (CPSO#: 91597)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Elliot Lake Family Health Team
31 Nova Scotia Walk
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1Y9
Phone: (705) 461-8882
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's General Hospital
70 Spine Rd.
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1X2
Canada
Phone: (705) 848-7181
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cherie Culic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Culic ( CPSO# 91597 )

Business Address:
Elliot Lake Family Health Team
31 Nova Scotia Walk
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1Y9
Phone Number: (705) 770-9440

Business Address:
St. Joseph's General Hospital
70 Spine Road
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1X2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHERIE ANN CULIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CULIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2013