Cull, Sonya Melissa (CPSO#: 82751)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-2895
Fax: (844) 847-8836
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adams Gilmour Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hadden ( CPSO# 100522)
Dr. C. Westbrook ( CPSO# 89258 )
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 88724 )
Dr. R. Wray ( CPSO# 86630 )
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 82718 )
Dr. A. Chiella ( CPSO# 74700 )
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 69023 )
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 59455 )
Dr. K. Best ( CPSO# 75245 )
Dr. R. Allin ( CPSO# 20746 )
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )
Dr. R. Adams ( CPSO# 72364 )
Dr. A. Dayal ( CPSO# 79055 )
Dr. K. Ferguson ( CPSO# 76506 )
Dr. M. Gilmour ( CPSO# 59725 )
Dr. S. Hyshka ( CPSO# 67972 )
Dr. N. Kazarian ( CPSO# 71482 )
Dr. G. Mercer ( CPSO# 60472 )
Dr. F. Nasser-Sharif ( CPSO# 72700 )
Dr. A. Pawley ( CPSO# 87461 )
Dr. P. Puckrin ( CPSO# 27488 )
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )
Dr. S. Shepherd ( CPSO# 71354 )
Dr. K. Smith ( CPSO# 66319 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 25659 )
Dr. M. Stewart ( CPSO# 62187 )
Dr. T. Stryde ( CPSO# 73931 )
Dr. J. Tuck ( CPSO# 64782 )
Dr. A. Armstrong ( CPSO# 84261 )
Dr. S. Cull ( CPSO# 82751 )
Dr. B. Tse ( CPSO# 91489 )
Dr. D. Wang ( CPSO# 90666 )
Dr. A. Gauster ( CPSO# 100273)
Dr. H. Nguyen ( CPSO# 88893 )

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SONYA MELISSA CULL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CULL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2007