Cullen, James Barrie (CPSO#: 20591)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Mar 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Mar 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
600 university ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 6093
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 18 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES BARRIE CULLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CULLEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Mar 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1970