Cullen, Nancy Christina (CPSO#: 54706)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 2004