Cullen, Nora Kathleen (CPSO#: 68098)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Feb 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Feb 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Park Healthcare Centre
82 Buttonwood Avenue
Toronto ON  M6M 2J5
Phone: (416) 243-3600 Ext. 2173
Fax: (416) 243-7711
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Rehab - UHN
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Canada
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 4200
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nora Cullen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Cullen ( CPSO# 68098 )

Business Address:
West Park Healthcare Centre
82 Buttonwood Avenue
Toronto ON  M6M 2J5
Phone Number: (416) 243-3600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NORA KATHLEEN CULLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CULLEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1999