Cunningham, Colin Duncan Baird (CPSO#: 26052)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone: (613) 432-4851 Ext. 859
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Francis Memorial Hospital
PO Box 129
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Canada
Phone: (613) 756-3044
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLIN DUNCAN BAIRD CUNNINGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUNNINGHAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1973
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2004