Cunningham, Frederick Alexander (CPSO#: 89283)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 550
34 2nd Avenue
Cardston AB  T0K 0K0
Phone: (403) 653-3331
Fax: (403) 653-1098

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FREDERICK ALEXANDER CUNNINGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUNNINGHAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Queen's University, 25 Oct 2011 to 02 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2011