Cunningham, Graeme Maccallum (CPSO#: 24232)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 15 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Incomplete Information

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Dec 2014