Cunningham, Ian Robert (CPSO#: 50311)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 24 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Oct 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 2012