Cunningham, Kristopher Shannon (CPSO#: 80968)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Forensic Pathology
Service Provincial Forensic
Pathology Unit
25 Morton Shulman Drive
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Phone: (416) 341-4040
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Laboratory Medicine
88 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N0
Canada
Phone: (613) 533-2820
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cunningham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Cunningham ( CPSO# 80968 )

Business Address:
Richardson Laboratory
Room 306B
88 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2820

Business Address:
Ontario Forensic Pathology Service
Pathology Unit
25 Morton Shulman Drive
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Phone Number: (647) 329-1881

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Pathology Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTOPHER SHANNON CUNNINGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUNNINGHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009