Cupido, Cynthia Marie (CPSO#: 69314)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
H S C 3E20
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76610
Fax: (905) 570-8973
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cynthia M. Cupido Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cupido ( CPSO# 69314 )

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
HSC 3E20
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CYNTHIA MARIE CUPIDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUPIDO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2000