Curea, Delia (CPSO#: 83397)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Cluj, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 311
4800 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Phone: (416) 222-5439
Fax: (416) 229-2513
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Delia Curea Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Curea ( CPSO# 83397 )

Business Address:
Suite 311
4800 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Phone Number: (416) 222-5439

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DELIA CUREA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUREA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2007