Curtis, Jacqueline Ruth (CPSO#: 68097)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Endocrinology
Hospital for Sick Children
Room 5114, Elm Wing
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 202464
Fax: (416) 813-6304
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenneth Pace Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Curtis ( CPSO# 68097 )
Dr. K. Pace ( CPSO# 68126 )

Business Address:
Suite 9 - 106
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3695

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 07 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE RUTH CURTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURTIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998