Curtis, John Edgar (CPSO#: 19636)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Apr 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2014