Curtis, Nickola Jean (CPSO#: 53007)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
655 Bay Street
Suite 1007
Toronto ON  M5G 2K4
Phone: (416) 408-1711
Fax: (416) 408-1207
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 17 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICKOLA JEAN CURTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURTIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1985