Curtis, Ronald Dean (CPSO#: 70369)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trinity Medical Centre
& Travel Clinic
18120 Yonge Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 4V8
Phone: (905) 895-0008
Fax: (905) 895-1816
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Doctors on Bayview
15900 Bayview Avenue
Aurora ON  L4G 7Y3
Canada
Phone: (905) 726-9755
Fax: (905) 726-9631
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ron Curtis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Curtis ( CPSO# 70369 )

Business Address:
Trinity Medical Centre & Travel Clinic
18120 Yonge Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 4V8
Phone Number: (905) 895-0008

Business Address:
15900 Bayview Avenue
Aurora ON  L4G 7Y3
Phone Number: (905) 726-9755

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Oct 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONALD DEAN CURTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURTIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1998