Curtis, Rosalind Margaret (CPSO#: 22408)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012