Curts, Dustin Jonathan (CPSO#: 95468)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
920 1st Ave West
Suite 201
Owen Sound, ON CA
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K5
Phone: 226 664 9200
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Curts Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Curts ( CPSO# 95468 )

Business Address:
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9

Business Address:
920 1st Avenue West
Suite 201
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 370-2225

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DUSTIN JONATHAN CURTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURTS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016