Curwin, Julie Marie (CPSO#: 71428)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 2004