Cusimano, Robert James (CPSO#: 54600)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Calgary, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
4N 468
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4928
Fax: (416) 340-5069
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert James Cusimano Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Cusimano ( CPSO# 54600 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
4N-468 - 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4928

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 11 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JAMES CUSIMANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUSIMANO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1984